Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/19/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/24/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/31/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/31/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/29/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/18/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/10/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/11/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/18/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/23/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/24/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/10/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/28/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/28/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/23/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/19/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/11/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/10/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/17/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/17/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/14/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/14/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/14/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/23/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/28/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/15/2010