Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/18/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/18/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/30/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/02/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/30/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/30/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/07/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 10/28/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/13/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 11/15/2010