Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 01/07/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/07/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 01/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/07/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/09/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/09/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/09/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/14/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 01/14/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/21/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/23/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 01/26/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 01/26/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 01/26/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/27/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/02/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/02/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/02/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/04/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/09/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/11/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/09/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/19/2009