Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/22/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/20/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/10/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/29/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 11/03/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/03/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/16/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/17/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/17/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/03/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/20/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/21/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/02/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/26/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/08/2010