Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/23/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/09/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/23/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/14/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/22/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/03/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/11/2010