Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/26/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/30/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/30/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/07/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/07/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/12/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/09/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/22/2010