Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/06/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/25/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/25/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/07/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/02/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/02/2009