Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/17/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/17/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/30/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/01/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 04/27/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/04/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/04/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/20/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/02/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/04/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/09/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/09/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/23/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/30/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/31/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/15/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/23/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/23/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/25/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/23/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/03/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/17/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 11/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/02/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 12/10/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/04/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/15/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/19/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/14/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/21/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/12/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/22/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 08/10/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/14/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/23/2010