Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/05/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/09/2009