Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/23/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/30/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/11/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/31/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/01/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 12/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/23/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/23/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/22/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/21/2010