Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/18/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/18/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010