Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/04/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/12/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/24/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/24/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/24/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/30/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/21/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/08/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/13/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/15/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/13/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/14/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/17/2010