Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/10/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/12/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/12/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/12/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/12/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/12/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/12/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/16/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/12/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/12/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/23/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 10/01/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/01/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/15/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/20/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/29/2009