Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/02/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/18/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/30/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/07/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/14/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/18/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/16/2009