Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/02/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/28/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/28/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/06/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/16/2009