Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/26/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/06/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/19/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/19/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/19/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/26/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/26/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/26/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/26/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/26/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/31/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/02/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/29/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/29/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/25/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/20/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/20/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/20/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/20/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/30/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/25/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/02/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/02/2010