Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/26/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/26/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/06/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/26/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/26/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/26/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/29/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/29/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/25/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/20/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/30/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/29/2010