Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/11/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/11/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/18/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/19/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/23/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/01/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/28/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/22/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/12/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/29/2010