Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/29/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/31/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 10/14/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/16/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/20/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/20/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/11/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/11/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/26/2010