Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/06/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/08/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/13/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/18/2010