Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/11/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/24/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/24/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/25/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/26/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/30/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/31/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/15/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/20/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/02/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/05/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/16/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/03/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/18/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/25/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/15/2010