Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/06/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/06/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 03/06/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/06/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/06/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/06/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/06/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/06/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/06/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/06/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/06/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/06/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/06/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/06/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/06/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/06/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/06/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/06/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/31/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/31/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/21/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/23/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/14/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/02/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/02/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/02/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/11/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/11/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/14/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/14/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/29/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/29/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/15/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 09/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/21/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/21/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/22/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/30/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/30/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/30/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/21/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/27/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 10/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/03/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/03/2009