Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/04/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 03/11/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/22/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/29/2010