Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/25/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/26/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/05/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/11/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/11/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/22/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/28/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/21/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/14/2010