Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/23/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/08/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/23/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/24/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/29/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/29/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/24/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/15/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/04/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/29/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/29/2010