Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/05/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/21/2009