Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/13/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/25/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/25/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/25/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/25/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 02/25/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/25/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/25/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/22/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/14/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/03/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/19/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/18/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/14/2010