Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/15/2009