Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/12/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/12/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/14/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/21/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/12/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/10/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/14/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/06/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/03/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/24/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/14/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/16/2010