Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/09/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/23/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/19/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/15/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/29/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/13/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/17/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/10/2010