Refine your search

Date Major Actions
02/17/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-5.
02/17/2009 Signed by President.
02/16/2009 Presented to President.
02/13/2009 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 60 - 38. Record Vote Number: 64.
02/13/2009 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 246 - 183, 1 Present (Roll no. 70).
02/12/2009 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 111-16 filed.(text of conference report: CR H1307-1516)
02/10/2009 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Inouye; Baucus; Reid; Cochran; Grassley.
02/10/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 37. Record Vote Number: 61.
01/28/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 244 - 188 (Roll no. 46).(text: CR H642-711)
01/26/2009 Introduced in House