Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/06/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/03/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/03/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/03/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/03/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/03/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/03/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/03/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/03/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/03/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/30/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/30/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/31/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/31/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/23/2008