Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/19/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/24/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/24/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/24/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/24/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/25/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/25/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/25/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/25/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/25/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/25/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/25/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/25/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/26/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/26/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/26/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/26/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/26/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/26/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/26/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/26/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/26/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/30/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/30/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/30/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/31/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/31/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/31/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/31/2007