Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/17/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/21/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/21/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/21/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/22/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/23/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/24/2008