Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/06/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/05/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/06/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/19/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/20/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/04/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/12/2008