Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/06/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/06/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/08/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/08/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/14/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/29/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/29/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/17/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/18/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/18/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/18/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/19/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/19/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/19/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/19/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/20/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/20/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/20/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/23/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/23/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/23/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/23/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/23/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/24/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 04/24/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/24/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/24/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/25/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/25/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/25/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/25/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/25/2007