Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/07/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/13/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/13/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/10/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/16/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/26/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/03/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/04/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/11/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/30/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 12/05/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/05/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/23/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew