Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/01/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/01/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/05/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/06/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/07/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/27/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/28/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/05/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/12/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/20/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/21/2007
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/28/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/12/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/03/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/09/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/04/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/15/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/22/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/26/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/30/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 08/02/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/05/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/30/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/03/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/08/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/11/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/17/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/24/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/25/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/25/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/15/2008