Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/29/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 07/29/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/09/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/09/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/09/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/11/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/11/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/11/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/11/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/16/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/16/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/16/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/16/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/16/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/16/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/16/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/16/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/16/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/16/2008
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 09/16/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/16/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/16/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/16/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/16/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/16/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/16/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/16/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/16/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/16/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/16/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/16/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/16/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/16/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/16/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/16/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/16/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/16/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/16/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/16/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/16/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/17/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/17/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/17/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/17/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/17/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/17/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/17/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/17/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/17/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/17/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/17/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/17/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/17/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/17/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/17/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/17/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/17/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/17/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/17/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/17/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/22/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/22/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/22/2008