Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/26/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/26/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/26/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/26/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/26/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/10/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/10/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/10/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/10/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/10/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/10/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/10/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/10/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/14/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/14/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/14/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/14/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/14/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/14/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/15/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/15/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/15/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/15/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/15/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/16/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/16/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/17/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/17/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/17/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/17/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/17/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/24/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/24/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/24/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/24/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/24/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/24/2008