Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 04/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/10/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/10/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/15/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/22/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/23/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/19/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/19/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/21/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/14/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/22/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/22/2008