Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/26/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 01/29/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/30/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/21/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/11/2007