Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/13/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/03/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/17/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/20/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/03/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/16/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/09/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/09/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/01/2008