Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/14/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/02/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/10/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/12/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/23/2008