Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/11/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 01/16/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/16/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/23/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 01/23/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/24/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/29/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/30/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/01/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 02/01/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/01/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/05/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/12/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/12/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 02/15/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/05/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/05/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/07/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/12/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/13/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/13/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/13/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/13/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/13/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/15/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/19/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/28/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/12/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/17/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/09/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/28/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/03/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/19/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/08/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/15/2008