Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 12/13/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 12/18/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 01/22/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 01/22/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/22/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/22/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 02/04/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/08/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/02/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/07/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/04/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/11/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/29/2008