Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/10/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 01/22/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 01/22/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/23/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/23/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/24/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 01/24/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/28/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/31/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/01/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/16/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/28/2008