Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 01/09/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/09/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/10/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/16/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/23/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/29/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/14/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/27/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/14/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/15/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/27/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/28/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/28/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/23/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/26/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/26/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/30/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/14/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/23/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/28/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/28/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/17/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/23/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/26/2008