Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/24/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 10/26/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/08/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/29/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/01/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/09/2008