Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/30/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/02/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/03/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/17/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/17/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/17/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/17/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/18/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/18/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/19/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/19/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/20/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/20/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/20/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/21/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/21/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/25/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/26/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/27/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/01/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 10/01/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/01/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/02/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/03/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/03/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 10/03/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/03/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/15/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/15/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 10/15/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/16/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/16/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 10/16/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 10/16/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 10/16/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/18/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/30/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 12/10/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/18/2008